Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1742 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2019
Bill April 16, 2019