Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1754 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2019

                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 1754
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 23, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 23, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution of the offense of taking or attempting
 to take a weapon from certain officers, investigators, employees,
 or officials.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 38.14(b), Penal Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (b)  A person commits an offense if the person intentionally
 or knowingly and with force takes or attempts to take from a peace
 officer, federal special investigator, employee or official of a
 correctional facility, parole officer, community supervision and
 corrections department officer, or commissioned security officer
 the officer's, investigator's, employee's, or official's firearm,
 nightstick, stun gun, or personal protection chemical dispensing
 device [with the intention of harming the officer, investigator,
 employee, or official or a third person].
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *