Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB177 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/06/2019

                            By: Perry S.B. No. 177
 (In the Senate - Filed November 13, 2018; February 1, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 6, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 6, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a petition filed for a place on the ballot as a
 candidate for the board of directors of the Wilbarger County
 Hospital District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1113.053, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1113.053.  BALLOT PETITION. A person who wants to have
 the person's name printed on the ballot as a candidate for director
 must file with the board secretary a petition requesting that
 action. The petition must be[:
 [(1)  signed by at least 100 registered voters; and
 [(2)]  filed by the deadline imposed by Section
 144.005, Election Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *