Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1792 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/08/2019

                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1792
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 18, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 8, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 8, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1792 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the maintenance of information entered into a fee
 record.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 51, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.609 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.609.  UNCOLLECTIBLE FEES. (a)  The clerk may
 request the court in which a court cost or fee was imposed on a party
 in a civil case to make a finding that the cost or fee is
 uncollectible if the cost or fee has been unpaid for at least 15
 years.
 (b)  On a finding by a court that a court cost or fee imposed
 on a party in a civil case is uncollectible, the court may order the
 clerk to designate the cost or fee as uncollectible in the fee
 record. The clerk shall attach a copy of the court's order to the
 fee record.
 (c)  This section does not apply to a court cost or fee
 imposed by the supreme court, the court of criminal appeals, or a
 court of appeals.
 SECTION 2.  Article 103.0081(c), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *