Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB18 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2019
Bill March 13, 2019