Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1805 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 1805
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 18, 2019, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
4+ April 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 17, 2019,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1805 By: Perry
29
310
411 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
512 AN ACT
613 relating to egg grading.
714 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
815 SECTION 1. Section 132.002, Agriculture Code, is amended to
916 read as follows:
1017 Sec. 132.002. SALE OF UNGRADED EGGS BY PRODUCER [LIMITATION
1118 OF CHAPTER]. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), this
1219 [This] chapter does not apply to a person selling only eggs that are
1320 produced by the person's own flock and for which the person does not
1421 claim a grade.
1522 (b) A person who produces eggs as described by Subsection
1623 (a) may sell the eggs directly to a consumer or at wholesale if the
1724 eggs are sold in a carton labeled with "ungraded" followed by
1825 "produced by (producer's name)" and the producer's address. The
1926 label information must be legible, must appear on the top panel of
2027 the carton, and may be preprinted on the carton, printed on a label
2128 attached to the carton, or hand printed on the carton. The carton
2229 may not display the name of a retailer or of a producer other than
2330 the producer whose flock produced the eggs.
2431 (c) A state agency or political subdivision may not prohibit
2532 a person described by Section 132.021(b) from purchasing,
2633 reselling, or using eggs described by Subsection (b).
2734 SECTION 2. Section 132.043(c), Agriculture Code, is amended
2835 to read as follows:
2936 (c) Licensees required by this section to collect or pay a
3037 special fee shall remit the fee [monthly] in accordance with rules
3138 established by the department. The rules may not require a licensee
3239 to remit the fee more often than:
3340 (1) monthly; or
3441 (2) annually, if the licensee is required to remit
3542 less than $360 for the year.
3643 SECTION 3. Not later than December 1, 2019, the Department
3744 of Agriculture shall adopt rules consistent with Section
3845 132.043(c), Agriculture Code, as amended by this Act.
3946 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
4047 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
4148 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
4249 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
4350 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
51+ * * * * *