Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1834 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/21/2019

                            S.B. No. 1834


 AN ACT
 relating to a study and pilot program regarding the use of
 incentives to purchase certain fruits or vegetables under the
 supplemental nutrition assistance program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 33, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 33.035 and 33.036 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.035.  PILOT PROGRAM TO INCENTIVIZE PURCHASE OF
 TEXAS-GROWN FRUITS OR VEGETABLES UNDER SNAP. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Eligible fruits or vegetables" means any variety
 of fresh, canned, dried, or frozen whole or cut fruits or
 vegetables:
 (A)  with no added sugars, fats, oils, or salt;
 and
 (B)  that are produced or harvested in this state.
 (2)  "Incentive" means a financial benefit provided to
 a recipient of supplemental nutrition assistance program benefits
 that encourages the recipient to purchase eligible fruits or
 vegetables.
 (3)  "Pilot program" means the pilot program described
 by Subsection (b).
 (4)  "Retailer" has the meaning assigned by Section
 33.0023.
 (b)  The commission, in consultation with the work group
 established under Subsection (c), may establish a pilot program in
 one or more geographic areas of this state through which:
 (1)  a recipient of supplemental nutrition assistance
 program benefits is able to receive an incentive when purchasing
 eligible fruits or vegetables from a retailer that may be used
 toward a subsequent purchase of eligible fruits or vegetables; and
 (2)  a retailer is authorized to publicize the
 incentive to recipients of supplemental nutrition assistance
 program benefits.
 (c)  The commission shall establish a work group to assist
 the commission with the study described by Section 33.036 and, as
 applicable, provide input for the establishment of the pilot
 program. The work group must be composed of relevant stakeholders
 from rural and urban areas throughout this state who have expertise
 in providing incentives under the supplemental nutrition
 assistance program. At least one member of the work group must have
 direct marketing representative experience in operating a
 comparable program.
 (d)  The executive commissioner shall appoint one member of
 the work group to serve as presiding officer.
 (e)  The work group is not subject to Chapter 2110,
 Government Code.
 (f)  A member of the work group may not receive compensation
 for serving on the work group and may not be reimbursed for travel
 or other expenses incurred while conducting the business of the
 work group.
 (g)  If the commission establishes the pilot program under
 this section, the commission may contract with an entity that has
 appropriate experience and expertise in administering comparable
 programs to administer the pilot program.
 (h)  The commission may solicit and accept gifts, grants, and
 donations from any source to establish and administer the pilot
 program or to perform any other duty under this section.
 (i)  If the commission establishes the pilot program under
 this section, the commission, with assistance from the work group,
 shall:
 (1)  develop and the executive commissioner shall
 submit any necessary applications to obtain a federal waiver to
 operate the pilot program; and
 (2)  apply for any available federal money to operate
 the program, including federal nutrition incentives available
 under Section 4205, Agriculture Improvement Act of 2018 (7 U.S.C.
 Section 7517).
 (j)  The commission may delay the operation of the pilot
 program, as applicable, until the commission receives federal money
 to operate the program or until money is appropriated or donated to
 the commission to operate the program.
 Sec. 33.036.  STUDY ON EXISTING PROGRAMS THAT INCENTIVIZE
 PURCHASE OF TEXAS-GROWN FRUITS OR VEGETABLES UNDER SNAP. (a)  In
 this section, "eligible fruits or vegetables" and "incentive" have
 the meanings assigned by Section 33.035.
 (b)  The commission, in consultation with the work group
 established under Section 33.035, shall conduct a study on programs
 in this state that provide incentives for the purchase of eligible
 fruits or vegetables under the supplemental nutrition assistance
 program. The study must include:
 (1)  an inventory of existing programs that provide
 incentives for the purchase of eligible fruits or vegetables under
 the supplemental nutrition assistance program, including details
 on how the programs are funded;
 (2)  recommendations on increasing the number and
 availability of programs in this state that provide incentives for
 the purchase of eligible fruits or vegetables under the
 supplemental nutrition assistance program; and
 (3)  an analysis of:
 (A)  strategies to encourage the purchase of
 eligible fruits or vegetables using supplemental nutrition
 assistance program benefits;
 (B)  the potential impact of programs in this
 state that provide incentives for the purchase of eligible fruits
 or vegetables on the specialty crop industry in this state; and
 (C)  federal programs and money available to
 encourage the purchase of eligible fruits or vegetables using
 supplemental nutrition assistance program benefits, including the
 Food Insecurity Nutrition Incentive (FINI) Grant Program operated
 by the United States Department of Agriculture.
 (c)  The commission may solicit and accept gifts, grants, and
 donations from any source to conduct the study.
 (d)  Not later than December 1, 2020, the commission shall
 prepare and submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, and each standing
 committee of the legislature having primary jurisdiction over
 health and human services a written report that summarizes the
 commission's findings under Subsection (b) and recommendations for
 legislative or other action.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement
 Sections 33.035 and 33.036, Human Resources Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1834 passed the Senate on
 April 25, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 26, Nays 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1834 passed the House on
 May 21, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 88, Nays 53,
 two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor