Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1840 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2019
Bill April 17, 2019