House | 04/11/2019 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |