| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 19, 2019, read |
---|
| 3 | + | first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; May 2, 2019, |
---|
| 4 | + | reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the |
---|
| 5 | + | following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 2, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 7 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1913 By: Zaffirini |
---|
2 | 8 | | |
---|
3 | 9 | | |
---|
4 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 12 | | relating to authorizing certain cities to change the date on which |
---|
7 | 13 | | their general election for officers is held. |
---|
8 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 41.0052, Election Code, is amended by |
---|
10 | 16 | | adding Subsection (f) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 17 | | (f) The governing body of a city with a population of 1.18 |
---|
12 | 18 | | million or more, located predominantly in a county that has a total |
---|
13 | 19 | | area of less than 1,000 square miles, that has adopted a |
---|
14 | 20 | | council-manager form of government and that holds its general |
---|
15 | 21 | | election for officers on a date other than the November uniform |
---|
16 | 22 | | election date may, not later than December 31, 2020, change the date |
---|
17 | 23 | | on which it holds its general election for officers to the November |
---|
18 | 24 | | uniform election date. This subsection expires January 1, 2021. |
---|
19 | 25 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|