Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 15, 2018

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019