2 | | - | (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 19, 2019, read |
---|
3 | | - | first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce; |
---|
4 | | - | April 16, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | | - | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 16, 2019, |
---|
6 | | - | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | | - | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1958 By: Creighton |
---|
15 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Section 885.311, Insurance Code, is amended by |
---|
17 | 10 | | amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read |
---|
18 | 11 | | as follows: |
---|
19 | 12 | | (a) A fraternal benefit society shall provide in the |
---|
20 | 13 | | fraternal benefit society's laws that if the society's reserves for |
---|
21 | 14 | | any class of the society's benefit certificates become impaired, |
---|
22 | 15 | | the society's supreme governing body or board of directors may |
---|
23 | 16 | | require the certificate holders to pay the society an equitable |
---|
24 | 17 | | proportion of the deficiency as determined by the governing body or |
---|
25 | 18 | | board. The aggregate assessment for the impaired reserves may not |
---|
26 | 19 | | exceed the total amount required to comply with Section 885.408. |
---|
27 | 20 | | (d) Not later than the 90th day before the proposed |
---|
28 | 21 | | effective date of an assessment under Subsection (a), the fraternal |
---|
29 | 22 | | benefit society shall file with the department an application for |
---|
30 | 23 | | approval of the assessment and a statement sworn to by the president |
---|
31 | 24 | | and secretary or corresponding officers of the society. The |
---|
32 | 25 | | statement must: |
---|
33 | 26 | | (1) include: |
---|
34 | 27 | | (A) the terms of the assessment, including the |
---|
35 | 28 | | proposed effective date; and |
---|
43 | | - | (e) After the department receives a completed application, |
---|
44 | | - | the commissioner may approve or disapprove the application. If the |
---|
45 | | - | commissioner does not approve or disapprove the application before |
---|
46 | | - | the 60th day after the date the department receives the completed |
---|
47 | | - | application, the application is considered approved. The |
---|
48 | | - | commissioner may impose an effective date earlier than the date |
---|
49 | | - | requested in the application if the earlier effective date is in the |
---|
50 | | - | best interests of the certificate holders. |
---|
| 36 | + | (e) The commissioner shall approve or disapprove an |
---|
| 37 | + | application under this section not later than the 60th day after the |
---|
| 38 | + | date the department receives the application. If the commissioner |
---|
| 39 | + | does not approve or disapprove the application before the |
---|
| 40 | + | expiration of the 60-day period, the application is considered |
---|
| 41 | + | approved. The commissioner may impose an effective date earlier |
---|
| 42 | + | than the date requested in the application if the earlier effective |
---|
| 43 | + | date is in the best interests of the certificate holders. |
---|
53 | | - | Sec. 885.407. SOLVENCY. (a) If a fraternal benefit |
---|
54 | | - | society reports admissible assets greater than the society's |
---|
55 | | - | liabilities in an amount that authorizes the commissioner to place |
---|
56 | | - | the society under regulatory control and the commissioner |
---|
57 | | - | reasonably believes the society's hazardous financial condition |
---|
58 | | - | will not be promptly remedied without intervention by the |
---|
59 | | - | department, the commissioner may order the society to promptly seek |
---|
60 | | - | and negotiate an agreement to transfer in accordance with this |
---|
61 | | - | section all benefit members, benefit certificates, assets, and |
---|
62 | | - | liabilities of the society to another fraternal benefit society. A |
---|
63 | | - | transfer under this section: |
---|
| 46 | + | Sec. 885.407. SOLVENCY. (a) If a fraternal benefit society |
---|
| 47 | + | reports a ratio of total adjusted capital to authorized control |
---|
| 48 | + | level risk-based capital that triggers an authorized control level |
---|
| 49 | + | as determined by the commissioner in accordance with 28 T.A.C. |
---|
| 50 | + | Section 7.402 and the commissioner reasonably believes the impaired |
---|
| 51 | + | society's financial condition will not be promptly remedied without |
---|
| 52 | + | intervention by the department, the commissioner may order the |
---|
| 53 | + | impaired society to promptly seek and negotiate an agreement to |
---|
| 54 | + | transfer in accordance with this section all benefit members, |
---|
| 55 | + | benefit certificates, assets, and liabilities of the impaired |
---|
| 56 | + | society to another fraternal benefit society. A transfer under this |
---|
| 57 | + | section: |
---|
78 | | - | (b) Not later than the seventh day before the date the |
---|
79 | | - | supreme governing body or board of directors of a fraternal benefit |
---|
80 | | - | society votes on a transfer proposed under Subsection (a), the |
---|
81 | | - | governing body or board shall provide the society's certificate |
---|
82 | | - | holders written notice of and an opportunity to comment on the |
---|
83 | | - | proposed transfer. If the governing body or board approves the |
---|
84 | | - | transfer, the governing body or board shall provide the certificate |
---|
85 | | - | holders' comments to the commissioner. |
---|
| 71 | + | (b) Not later than the 30th day after the date the |
---|
| 72 | + | commissioner approves a transfer under Subsection (a), the impaired |
---|
| 73 | + | society transferring the certificates shall notify the certificate |
---|
| 74 | + | holders of the transfer. |
---|
94 | 83 | | (d) The commissioner may grant to a fraternal benefit |
---|
95 | 84 | | society that is not authorized to engage in the business of |
---|
96 | 85 | | insurance in this state the authority to service benefit |
---|
97 | 86 | | certificates transferred pursuant to Subsection (a) and fulfill all |
---|
98 | 87 | | obligations to the holders of the certificates. Commissioner |
---|
99 | 88 | | action under this subsection does not authorize the fraternal |
---|
100 | 89 | | benefit society to otherwise engage in the business of insurance in |
---|
101 | 90 | | this state. |
---|
102 | 91 | | (e) A transfer under Subsection (a) may be made to an |
---|
103 | 92 | | insurer that is not a fraternal benefit society if the insurer is |
---|
104 | 93 | | authorized to engage in the business of insurance in this state. A |
---|
105 | 94 | | holder of a certificate subject to a transfer as authorized by this |
---|
106 | 95 | | subsection is deemed to agree that any term in the certificate, |
---|
107 | 96 | | including a term that makes the certificate subject to the |
---|
108 | 97 | | transferring society's laws or that provides for maintenance of the |
---|
109 | 98 | | transferring society's solvency that is inconsistent with transfer |
---|
110 | 99 | | to an insurer that is not a fraternal benefit society, is void on |
---|
111 | 100 | | transfer of the certificate. The receiving insurer shall endorse |
---|
112 | | - | on a form approved by the commissioner each benefit certificate |
---|
113 | | - | received by a transfer made under this section to reflect any terms |
---|
114 | | - | of the certificate voided by this subsection. A certificate |
---|
115 | | - | holder's obligation to pay an outstanding assessment under Section |
---|
116 | | - | 885.311 that is not released under the transfer agreement is not |
---|
117 | | - | released or voided by this subsection. |
---|
| 101 | + | each benefit certificate received by a transfer made under this |
---|
| 102 | + | section to reflect any terms of the certificate voided by this |
---|
| 103 | + | subsection. A certificate holder's obligation to pay an |
---|
| 104 | + | outstanding assessment under Section 885.311 that is not released |
---|
| 105 | + | under the transfer agreement is not released or voided by this |
---|
| 106 | + | subsection. |
---|
128 | 118 | | SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act to Section |
---|
129 | 119 | | 885.311, Insurance Code, apply only to an assessment by a fraternal |
---|
130 | 120 | | benefit society with an effective date on or after January 1, 2020. |
---|
131 | 121 | | An assessment by a fraternal benefit society with an effective date |
---|
132 | 122 | | before January 1, 2020, is governed by the law as it existed |
---|
133 | 123 | | immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is |
---|
134 | 124 | | continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
135 | 125 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|