Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB198 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2018

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019