Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 15, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2019
Bill February 15, 2019