Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB201 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 2, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 2, 2019
Bill March 6, 2019