4 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 7 | | relating to a study and report regarding streamlining physician |
---|
6 | 8 | | licensing requirements for advanced practice registered nurses. |
---|
7 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is |
---|
9 | 11 | | amended by adding Section 61.06693 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 12 | | Sec. 61.06693. STUDY REGARDING STREAMLINING PHYSICIAN |
---|
11 | 13 | | LICENSING REQUIREMENTS FOR ADVANCED PRACTICE REGISTERED NURSES. |
---|
12 | 14 | | (a) The board shall collaborate with at least one institution of |
---|
13 | 15 | | higher education, the Texas Medical Board, and the Texas Board of |
---|
14 | 16 | | Nursing to conduct a study regarding the feasibility of developing |
---|
15 | 17 | | a pilot program to streamline the requirements for an advanced |
---|
16 | 18 | | practice registered nurse to become eligible under Chapter 155, |
---|
17 | 19 | | Occupations Code, for a license to practice medicine. |
---|
18 | 20 | | (b) Not later than December 1, 2020, the board shall submit |
---|
19 | 21 | | to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house |
---|
20 | 22 | | of representatives, and each legislative standing committee with |
---|
21 | 23 | | primary jurisdiction over matters relating to higher education or |
---|
22 | 24 | | occupational licensing a report on the results of the study and any |
---|
23 | 25 | | recommendations for legislative or other action. |
---|
24 | 26 | | (c) This section expires September 1, 2021. |
---|
25 | 27 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
26 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
27 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
28 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2011 passed the Senate on |
---|
29 | | - | May 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
30 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
31 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
32 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2011 passed the House on |
---|
33 | | - | May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 8, two |
---|
34 | | - | present not voting. |
---|
35 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
36 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
37 | | - | Approved: |
---|
38 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
39 | | - | Date |
---|
40 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
41 | | - | Governor |
---|