Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2018 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/22/2019

                            S.B. No. 2018


 AN ACT
 relating to abolishing a dissolution committee established to
 abolish certain county boards of education or boards of county
 school trustees and appointing commissioners courts to assume the
 duties of the dissolution committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 15.001, Chapter 967 (S.B. 2065), Acts of
 the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017, is amended by amending
 Subsections (b), (n), and (s) and adding Subsections (t), (u), (v),
 (w), (x), (y), and (z) to read as follows:
 (b)  If on the effective date of this Act there is an existing
 contract for transportation services to which a county board of
 education, board of county school trustees, or office of county
 school superintendent is a party, it shall be wound down in the
 manner described by Subsections (c)-(z) [(c)-(r)] of this section.
 (n)  The [In the manner provided by rule of the commissioner
 of education, the] county shall collect and use any delinquent
 taxes imposed by or on behalf of the county board of education or
 board of county school trustees for payment of debt described by
 Subsection (t) of this section. On completion of payment of all
 debt described by Subsection (t) of this section, any delinquent
 taxes collected under this subsection must be distributed on a
 proportionate basis to the school districts in the county, based on
 the percentage of each district's number of enrolled students in
 the county to all students enrolled in the county in the school year
 immediately preceding the year of the distribution.
 (s)  Any dissolution committee created as provided by this
 Act is abolished on September 1, 2019, and all duties and
 obligations of the committee are transferred to the commissioners
 court of the county in which the county board of education or board
 of county school trustees was located. On September 1, 2019, the
 commissioners court assumes control of and responsibility for
 administering all assets, liabilities, debts, contracts, and other
 obligations of the county board of education, board of county
 school trustees, or dissolution committee and shall take control of
 any funds of the dissolution committee, including any sinking fund
 created by the dissolution committee as provided by Subsection (h)
 of this section.  Any liability, debt, contract, or other
 obligation of the county board of education, board of county school
 trustees, or dissolution committee transferred to the county as
 provided by this subsection may only be paid from the tax levied
 under Subsection (t) of this section, the sinking fund created
 under Subsection (h) of this section, and any funds transferred
 from the committee to the commissioners court. County assets,
 including tax revenue funds, may not be used to pay, and are not
 subject to, any liability, debt, contract, or other obligation
 transferred to the commissioners court under this subsection [the
 date all debt obligations of the county board of education or board
 of county school trustees are paid in full and all assets
 distributed to component school districts].
 (t)  The commissioners court shall continue to assess, levy,
 and collect any ad valorem tax adopted by the county board of
 education, board of county school trustees, or dissolution
 committee. The commissioners court shall continue to levy the tax
 annually at the rate of one cent per $100 of ad valorem valuation,
 as previously adopted by the dissolution committee, only until all
 debt of the county board of education or board of county school
 trustees described in a final judgment of a district court in
 litigation between the dissolution committee and the county is
 discharged in accordance with the terms of that judgment.
 Notwithstanding Section 44.004, Education Code, Chapter 26, Tax
 Code, or any other law, the commissioners court is not required to
 calculate a rate, publish notice of a budget and tax rate hearing,
 conduct a hearing, or take any other action each year to assess,
 levy, and collect the tax authorized by this subsection.
 (u)  The commissioners court may deduct from the proceeds of
 the ad valorem tax assessed, levied, and collected by the
 commissioners court under Subsection (t) of this section a
 reasonable and proportionate share for the administrative costs of
 collecting the tax.
 (v)  The commissioners court shall pay all other debts or
 claims not described by Subsection (t) of this section, including
 claims for workers' compensation and unemployment compensation
 filed on or before September 1, 2019, from funds reserved and
 retained by the dissolution committee for that purpose.
 (w)  All claims against the county board of education, board
 of county school trustees, or dissolution committee not filed on or
 before September 1, 2019, are barred. A lawsuit may not be filed
 against the county board of education, board of county school
 trustees, or dissolution committee after September 1, 2019. This
 provision takes precedence over any other statute of limitations.
 (x)  The commissioners court may use funds described by
 Subsection (v) of this section to perform the duties related to the
 abolishment of the dissolution committee and the administration of
 the assets, liabilities, debts, contracts, or other obligations
 transferred to the commissioners court, including:
 (1)  paying reasonable administrative expenses,
 including legal fees and expenses incurred by the county or any
 third party; and
 (2)  employing or contracting with any person needed to
 assist with the abolishment and dissolution of the county board of
 education, board of county school trustees, or dissolution
 committee and the administration of the assets, liabilities, debts,
 contracts, or other obligations transferred to the commissioners
 court.
 (y)  On completion of payment of all debt as provided by
 Subsection (t) of this section and any other debts or claims under
 Subsection (v) of this section, any remaining money must be
 distributed on a proportionate basis to the school districts in the
 county, based on the percentage of each district's number of
 enrolled students in the county to all students enrolled in the
 county in the school year immediately preceding the year of the
 distribution.  To the extent this subsection conflicts with
 Subsection (o) of this section, this subsection prevails.
 (z)  An ad valorem tax imposed under Subsection (t) of this
 section is not considered to be an ad valorem tax imposed by the
 county in which the county board of education, board of county
 school trustees, or dissolution committee is located for purposes
 of any constitutional or statutory limit on the ad valorem tax rate
 of the county.
 SECTION 2.  Section 18, Chapter 925 (S.B. 1566), Acts of the
 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2018 passed the Senate on
 April 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 21, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2018 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 14, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor