Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2086 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 2086
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
4+ May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 9, 2019, sent
6+ to printer.)
7+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2086 By: Perry
28
39
410 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
511 AN ACT
612 relating to a single Internet portal or equivalent electronic
713 system through which Medicaid providers may submit and receive
814 information.
915 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1016 SECTION 1. Section 533.0055, Government Code, is amended by
1117 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c), (d), (e), and
1218 (f) to read as follows:
1319 (b) The provider protection plan required under this
1420 section must provide for:
1521 (1) prompt payment and proper reimbursement of
1622 providers by managed care organizations;
1723 (2) prompt and accurate adjudication of claims
1824 through:
1925 (A) provider education on the proper submission
2026 of clean claims and on appeals;
2127 (B) acceptance of uniform forms, including HCFA
2228 Forms 1500 and UB-92 and subsequent versions of those forms,
2329 through an interoperable electronic portal or equivalent
2430 electronic system; and
2531 (C) the establishment of standards for claims
2632 payments in accordance with a provider's contract;
2733 (3) adequate and clearly defined provider network
2834 standards that are specific to provider type, including physicians,
2935 general acute care facilities, and other provider types defined in
3036 the commission's network adequacy standards in effect on January 1,
3137 2013, and that ensure choice among multiple providers to the
3238 greatest extent possible;
3339 (4) a prompt credentialing process for providers;
3440 (5) uniform efficiency standards and requirements for
3541 managed care organizations for the submission and tracking of
3642 preauthorization requests for services provided under Medicaid;
3743 (6) establishment and maintenance of an interoperable
3844 [electronic process, including the use of an] Internet portal or
3945 equivalent electronic system with real-time capabilities [,]
4046 through which providers in any managed care organization's provider
4147 network may:
4248 (A) submit electronic claims, prior
4349 authorization requests, claims appeals and reconsiderations,
4450 clinical data, and other documentation that the managed care
4551 organization requests for prior authorization and claims
4652 processing; and
4753 (B) obtain electronic remittance advice,
4854 explanation of benefits statements, and other standardized
4955 reports;
5056 (7) the measurement of the rates of retention by
5157 managed care organizations of significant traditional providers;
5258 (8) the creation of a work group to review and make
5359 recommendations to the commission concerning any requirement under
5460 this subsection for which immediate implementation is not feasible
5561 at the time the plan is otherwise implemented, including the
5662 required process for submission and acceptance of attachments for
5763 claims processing and prior authorization requests through the
5864 Internet portal or equivalent electronic system required by [an
5965 electronic process under] Subdivision (6) and, for any requirement
6066 that is not implemented immediately, recommendations regarding the
6167 expected:
6268 (A) fiscal impact of implementing the
6369 requirement; and
6470 (B) timeline for implementation of the
6571 requirement; and
6672 (9) any other provision that the commission determines
6773 will ensure efficiency or reduce administrative burdens on
6874 providers participating in a Medicaid managed care model or
6975 arrangement.
7076 (c) The commission, using existing resources, shall
7177 consolidate each electronic or Internet portal operated or
7278 maintained by the commission for the commission's use, including
7379 through a contract with a separate entity, that is used to receive
7480 and deliver requests and other information from and to Medicaid
7581 providers, including nursing facility providers participating in
7682 the STAR+PLUS Medicaid managed care program, into the single
7783 Internet portal or equivalent electronic system required by
7884 Subsection (b)(6). The commission shall:
7985 (1) ensure the single Internet portal or equivalent
8086 electronic system meets the requirements of a portal described by
8187 Sections 531.02411, 533.00251, 533.002553, and 533.0071; and
8288 (2) implement a method that allows:
8389 (A) each managed care organization to connect
8490 with the single Internet portal or equivalent electronic system;
8591 and
8692 (B) a provider to access the single Internet
8793 portal or equivalent electronic system both directly and through a
8894 managed care organization's Internet website.
8995 (d) The commission may contract with a private or nonprofit
9096 entity to develop, operate, and maintain the single Internet portal
9197 or equivalent electronic system required by Subsection (b)(6). The
92- entity may not be affiliated with any specific managed care plan.
98+ entity may not be affiliated with any specific managed care plan,
99+ the Texas Medicaid and Healthcare Partnership, or another entity
100+ serving as the state's Medicaid claims administrator.
93101 (e) The executive commissioner by rule shall require each
94102 managed care organization to allow providers in the organization's
95103 provider network to use the single Internet portal or equivalent
96104 electronic system required by Subsection (b)(6).
97105 (f) Notwithstanding any other law, a provider in a managed
98106 care organization's provider network may continue to use a provider
99107 portal made available by the managed care organization that is
100108 interoperable with the single Internet portal or equivalent
101109 electronic system, as applicable, required by Subsection (b)(6)
102110 instead of accessing the single Internet portal or equivalent
103111 electronic system directly.
104112 SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2021, the Health and
105113 Human Services Commission, or an entity with which the commission
106114 contracts, shall develop and implement the single Internet portal
107115 or equivalent electronic system required by Section 533.0055,
108116 Government Code, as amended by this Act.
109117 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
110118 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
111119 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
112120 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
113121 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
122+ * * * * *