|
06/07/2019
|
Effective on 9/1/19
|
|
|
|
06/07/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Record vote RV#1392
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Article III, Section 35(b)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Point of order overruled Rule 8, Section 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Amended 2-Dutton
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 1-Dutton
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Dutton
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Amended 3-Schaefer
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Amended 7-Cain
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Point of order overruled Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Record vote RV#1378
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Amendment tabled 6-Tinderholt
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Record vote RV#1377
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Amendment tabled 5-Holland and Canales
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Amended 4-Dutton
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Amended 2-Zerwas
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Amended 1-Zerwas
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2019
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|