Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2104 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            S.B. No. 2104


 AN ACT
 relating to certain advocacy and legal services for Texas Veterans
 and to tuition and fees for certain military spouses and
 dependents.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 434.017(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  Money in the fund may only be appropriated to the Texas
 Veterans Commission. Money appropriated under this subsection
 shall be used to:
 (1)  make grants to address veterans' needs;
 (2)  make grants to provide pro bono legal services to
 veterans, active duty members of the United States armed forces,
 and members of the state military forces;
 (3)  administer the fund; and
 (4) [(3)]  analyze and investigate data received from
 the federal Public Assistance Reporting Information System (PARIS)
 that is administered by the Administration for Children and
 Families of the United States Department of Health and Human
 Services.
 SECTION 2.  Section 434.0171, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 434.0171.  STATE EMPLOYEE CONTRIBUTIONS TO FUND FOR
 VETERANS' ASSISTANCE. For purposes of Subchapter I, Chapter 659:
 (1)  the Texas Veterans Commission, for the sole
 purpose of managing the fund for veterans' assistance, is
 considered an eligible charitable organization entitled to
 participate in the state employee charitable campaign; and
 (2)  a state employee is entitled to authorize a
 deduction for contributions to the Texas Veterans Commission for
 the purposes of managing the fund for veterans' assistance as a
 charitable contribution under Section 659.132, and the Texas
 Veterans Commission may use the contributions for the purposes
 listed in Section 434.017(c)[, as redesignated and amended by
 Chapter 1418 (H.B. 3107), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2007].
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter B, Chapter 434, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 434.040 to read as follows:
 Sec. 434.040.  TEXAS VETERANS COUNTY SERVICE OFFICER TASK
 FORCE. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Rural county" means a county with a population of
 less than 200,000.
 (2)  "Task force" means the Texas Veterans County
 Service Officer Task Force.
 (3)  "Urban county" means a county with a population of
 200,000 or more.
 (b)  The Texas Veterans County Service Officer Task Force is
 established to study the impact and efficacy of officers in this
 state.
 (c)  The task force is composed of the following nine
 members:
 (1)  the chair of the House Committee on Defense and
 Veterans' Affairs;
 (2)  the chair of the Senate Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Border Security;
 (3)  a representative of the commission;
 (4)  the chair of the Veterans County Service Officer
 Advisory Committee;
 (5)  a representative of the Texas Coalition of
 Veterans Organizations;
 (6)  an officer representing a rural county selected by
 the chair of the House Committee on Defense and Veterans' Affairs;
 (7)  an officer representing an urban county selected
 by the chair of the House Committee on Defense and Veterans'
 Affairs;
 (8)  an officer representing a rural county selected by
 the chair of the Senate Committee on Veteran Affairs and Border
 Security; and
 (9)  an officer representing an urban county selected
 by the chair of the Senate Committee on Veteran Affairs and Border
 Security.
 (d)  The chairs of the House Committee on Defense and
 Veterans' Affairs and Senate Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Border Security serve as co-chairs of the task force.
 (e)  A recommendation of the task force must be approved by a
 majority vote of the members of the task force.
 (f)  Each member of the task force has one vote.
 (g)  The task force shall:
 (1)  examine the role and duties of officers in each
 county;
 (2)  identify the regions of this state that are in need
 of officers; and
 (3)  determine types and levels of support needed from
 this state in order for officers to appropriately advocate for the
 veterans served by the officers.
 (h)  Not later than December 1, 2020, the commission shall
 prepare and submit a report based on recommendations of the task
 force regarding the issues described in Subsection (g) to the
 Senate Committee on Veteran Affairs and Border Security and House
 Committee on Defense and Veterans' Affairs.  The report must be
 approved by a majority vote of the members of the task force.
 (i)  This section expires January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 4.  Section 434.154(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The council may, by majority vote, establish the
 following coordinating workgroups to focus on specific issues
 affecting veterans, servicemembers, and their families:
 (1)  health;
 (2)  mental health;
 (3)  employment;
 (4)  higher education;
 (5)  criminal justice;
 (6)  housing;
 (7)  transportation;
 (8)  women veterans;
 (9)  pro bono legal services for veterans, including
 opportunities and obstacles for providing those services; and
 (10) [(9)]  any other coordinating workgroup
 considered necessary.
 SECTION 5.  Section 54.241(g), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (g)  If a member of the Armed Forces of the United States is
 stationed outside Texas, an [and the member's spouse or child
 establishes residence in Texas by residing in Texas and by filing
 with the Texas institution of higher education at which the spouse
 or child plans to register a letter of intent to establish residence
 in Texas, the] institution of higher education shall:
 (1)  permit the member's spouse or child to pay the
 tuition, fees, and other charges provided for Texas residents
 without regard to the length of time that the spouse or child has
 resided in Texas if the spouse or child establishes residence in
 Texas by residing in Texas and by filing with the Texas institution
 of higher education at which the spouse or child plans to register a
 letter of intent to establish residence in Texas; and
 (2)  permit the member's spouse to pay the tuition,
 fees, and other charges provided for Texas residents if the spouse:
 (A)  graduated from a public or private high
 school in this state or received the equivalent of a high school
 diploma in this state; and
 (B)  maintained a domicile in this state
 continuously for at least one year before the member was assigned to
 duty outside Texas.
 SECTION 6.  Section 54.241, Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies beginning with tuition and fees charged for the
 2019 fall semester.
 SECTION 7.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
 this section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 (b)  Section 54.241, Education Code, as amended by this Act,
 takes effect immediately if this Act receives a vote of two-thirds
 of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39,
 Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the
 vote necessary for immediate effect, Section 54.241, Education
 Code, as amended by this Act, takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2104 passed the Senate on
 April 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 25, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2104 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 1, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor