Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB212 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2018

Engrossed

Bill March 26, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2019
Bill March 7, 2019