Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2128 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2019

                    S.B. No. 2128


 AN ACT
 relating to the recording by a county clerk of certain documents
 concerning real or personal property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 193.003(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The index must be a cross-index that contains the names
 of the grantors and grantees in alphabetical order. If a deed is
 made by a sheriff, the index entry must contain the name of the
 sheriff and the defendant in execution. If a deed is made by an
 executor, administrator, or guardian, the index entry must contain
 the name of that person and the name of the person's testator,
 intestate, or ward. If a deed is made by an attorney, the index
 entry must contain the name of the attorney and the attorney's
 constituents. If a deed is made by a commissioner or trustee, the
 index entry must contain the name of the commissioner or trustee and
 the name of the person whose estate is conveyed. The index entry
 for a correction instrument must contain the names of the grantors
 and grantees as stated in the correction instrument. The index
 entry for a paper document described by Section 12.0011(b)(3),
 Property Code, must contain the names of the grantors and grantees.
 SECTION 2.  Section 12.0011(b), Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A paper document concerning real or personal property
 may not be recorded or serve as notice of the paper document unless:
 (1)  the paper document contains an original signature
 or signatures that are acknowledged, sworn to with a [proper]
 jurat, or proved according to law; [or]
 (2)  the paper document is attached as an exhibit to a
 paper affidavit or other document that has an original signature or
 signatures that are acknowledged, sworn to with a [proper] jurat,
 or proved according to law; or
 (3)  the paper document is a tangible copy of an
 electronic record that has been declared to be a true and correct
 copy of the electronic record as provided by Section 12.0013 by a
 notary public or other officer who may take an acknowledgment or
 proof of a written instrument under Section 121.001, Civil Practice
 and Remedies Code.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 12, Property Code, is amended by adding
 Section 12.0013 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.0013.  RECORDATION OF PAPER OR TANGIBLE COPY OF
 ELECTRONIC RECORD. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Document" means information that is inscribed on
 a tangible medium or that is stored in an electronic or other medium
 and is retrievable in perceivable form.
 (2)  "Electronic," "electronic record," and
 "electronic signature" have the meanings assigned by Section
 322.002, Business & Commerce Code.
 (b)  A county clerk shall record a paper or tangible copy of
 an electronic record that is otherwise eligible under state law to
 be recorded in the real property records if the paper or tangible
 copy of the electronic record:
 (1)  contains an image of an electronic signature or
 signatures that are acknowledged, sworn to with a jurat, or proved
 according to law; and
 (2)  has been declared by a notary public or other
 officer who may take an acknowledgment or proof under Section
 121.001, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, to be a true and correct
 copy of the electronic record as provided by Subsection (d).
 (c)  A document that is a paper or tangible copy of an
 electronic record and is printed and declared to be a true and
 correct copy as provided by Subsection (d) satisfies any
 requirement of law that, as a condition for recording, the
 document:
 (1)  be an original or be in writing;
 (2)  be signed or contain an original signature, if the
 document contains an image of an electronic signature of the person
 required to sign the document; and
 (3)  be notarized, acknowledged, verified, witnessed,
 made under oath, sworn to with a jurat, or proved according to law,
 if the document contains an image of an electronic signature of the
 person authorized to perform that act and all other information
 required to be included.
 (d)  A notary public or other officer who may take an
 acknowledgment or proof under Section 121.001, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, may declare that a paper or tangible copy of an
 electronic record is a true and correct copy of an electronic record
 by:
 (1)  executing and attaching an official seal to a
 tangible paper declaration under penalty of perjury; and
 (2)  affixing or attaching the declaration to the
 printed paper or tangible copy of an electronic record.
 (e)  The form of declaration required under Subsection (d)
 must be substantially as follows:
 DECLARATION OF AUTHENTICITY
 State of ________________
 County of _______________
 The attached document, ________________(insert title), dated
 ____________ and containing __ pages, is a true and correct copy of
 an electronic record printed by me or under my supervision. At the
 time of printing, no security features present on the electronic
 record indicated any changes or errors in an electronic signature
 or other information in the electronic record after the electronic
 record's creation or execution. This declaration is made under
 penalty of perjury.
 Signed this ____ day of ________, ____.
 ________________(signature of notary public or other officer)
 (seal of office)
 ________________(printed name of notary public or other officer)
 My commission expires:  ______________
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2128 passed the Senate on
 April 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2128 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor