Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2136 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            S.B. No. 2136


 AN ACT
 relating to the admissibility of evidence in the prosecution of an
 offense against a family member or certain other individuals or
 involving exploitation of certain vulnerable individuals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Article 38.371, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 Art. 38.371.  EVIDENCE IN PROSECUTION [PROSECUTIONS] OF
 OFFENSE COMMITTED AGAINST MEMBER OF DEFENDANT'S FAMILY OR HOUSEHOLD
 OR PERSON IN DATING RELATIONSHIP WITH DEFENDANT [CERTAIN OFFENSES
 INVOLVING FAMILY VIOLENCE].
 SECTION 2.  Article 38.371(a), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This article applies to a proceeding in the prosecution
 of a defendant for an offense, or for an attempt or conspiracy to
 commit an offense, for which the alleged victim is [that is
 committed under:
 [(1) Section 22.01, 22.02, or 22.04, Penal Code,
 against] a person whose relationship to or association with the
 defendant is described by Section 71.0021(b), 71.003, or 71.005,
 Family Code[; or
 [(2) Section 25.07 or 25.072, Penal Code, if the offense
 is based on a violation of an order or a condition of bond in a case
 involving family violence].
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 38, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 38.471 to read as follows:
 Art. 38.471.  EVIDENCE IN PROSECUTION FOR EXPLOITATION OF
 CHILD, ELDERLY INDIVIDUAL, OR DISABLED INDIVIDUAL. (a)  In the
 prosecution of an offense under Section 32.53, Penal Code, evidence
 that the defendant has engaged in other conduct that is similar to
 the alleged criminal conduct may be admitted for the purpose of
 showing the defendant's knowledge or intent regarding an element of
 the offense.
 (b)  Rule 403, Texas Rules of Evidence, applies to this
 article.  This article does not permit the presentation of
 character evidence that would otherwise be inadmissible under the
 Texas Rules of Evidence or other applicable law.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies to the
 admissibility of evidence in a criminal proceeding that commences
 on or after the effective date of this Act.  The admissibility of
 evidence in a criminal proceeding that commences before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the proceeding commenced, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2136 passed the Senate on
 May 7, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2136 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor