Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Record vote RV#1673
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Record vote RV#1596
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 2-Thierry
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amendment tabled 1-Price
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|