Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2150 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2019

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 2150
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 1, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 1, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2150 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reporting of certain information on maternal
 mortality to the Department of State Health Services and the
 confidentiality of that information.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 34.001, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivisions (11-a) and (12-a) and amending
 Subdivisions (12) and (14) to read as follows:
 (11-a)  "Pregnancy-associated death" means the death
 of a woman by any cause that occurs during or within one year of
 delivery or end of pregnancy, regardless of the outcome or location
 of the pregnancy.
 (12)  "Pregnancy-related death" means the death of a
 woman while pregnant or within one year of delivery or end of
 pregnancy, regardless of the outcome, duration, or location [and
 site] of the pregnancy, from any cause related to or aggravated by
 the pregnancy or its management, but not from accidental or
 incidental causes.
 (12-a)  "Review committee" means the Maternal Mortality
 and Morbidity Review Committee.
 (14)  "Task force" means the review committee [Maternal
 Mortality and Morbidity Task Force].
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 34.002, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 34.002.  MATERNAL MORTALITY AND MORBIDITY REVIEW
 COMMITTEE; REFERENCE IN LAW [TASK FORCE].
 SECTION 3.  Section 34.002, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a) and (e) and adding Subsection
 (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a)  The Maternal Mortality and Morbidity Review Committee
 [Task Force] is administered by the department.
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding any other law, a reference in this
 chapter or other law to the Maternal Mortality and Morbidity Task
 Force means the Maternal Mortality and Morbidity Review Committee.
 (e)  A member of the task force appointed under Subsection
 (b)(1) is not entitled to compensation for service on the task force
 but, subject to Section 34.014(b), may be reimbursed [or
 reimbursement] for travel or other expenses incurred by the member
 while conducting the business of the task force.
 SECTION 4.  Section 34.009(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Any information pertaining to a pregnancy-associated
 death, a pregnancy-related death, or severe maternal morbidity is
 confidential for purposes of this chapter.
 SECTION 5.  Section 34.014, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 34.014.  FUNDING.  (a) The department may accept gifts
 and grants from any source to fund the duties of the department and
 the task force under this chapter.
 (b)  The department may use only gifts, grants, or federal
 funds to reimburse travel or other expenses incurred by a member of
 the task force in accordance with Section 34.002(e).
 SECTION 6.  Section 34.008, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  For purposes of this chapter, a licensed health care
 provider, including a nurse, who is involved in obtaining
 information relevant to a case of pregnancy-associated death,
 pregnancy-related death, or severe maternal morbidity under this
 chapter and who is required under other law to report a violation
 related to the provider's profession is exempt from the requirement
 to report the violation for information obtained under this
 chapter.
 SECTION 7.  Section 34.017, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to read as follows:
 (c)  The department may allow voluntary and confidential
 reporting to the department of pregnancy-associated deaths and
 pregnancy-related deaths by health care professionals, health care
 facilities, and persons who complete the medical certification for
 a death certificate for deaths reviewed or analyzed by the review
 committee.
 (d)  The department shall allow voluntary and confidential
 reporting to the department of pregnancy-associated deaths and
 pregnancy-related deaths by family members of or other appropriate
 individuals associated with a deceased patient. The department
 shall:
 (1)  post on the department's Internet website the
 contact information of the person to whom a report may be submitted
 under this subsection; and
 (2)  conduct outreach to local health organizations on
 the availability of the review committee to review and analyze the
 deaths.
 (e)  Information reported to the department under this
 section is confidential in accordance with Section 34.009.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *