|
06/07/2019
|
Effective on 9/1/19
|
|
|
|
06/07/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Motion to concur withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Motion to concur in House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1508
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1507
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1500
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1499
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amended 23-Stickland
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 23-Stickland
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 22-Biedermann
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1498
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 21-Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1497
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 20-Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1496
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 19-Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1495
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 18-Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 17-Minjarez, S. Davis, Walle, Cortez, Bucy, Howard, J. González, Blanco, Collier, More
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1494
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 16-Hinojosa
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1493
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 15-Cole
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1492
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 14-Zwiener, S. Davis, Collier, Talarico, Rodriguez, Martinez Fischer, Anchia, J. González, More
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1491
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 13-Bucy, Perez, Goodwin, J. González, Lopez, Martinez Fischer, Collier, Nevárez, Talarico, More
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1490
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 12-Talarico
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1489
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 11-Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1488
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 10-Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1487
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 9-Beckley
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1486
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 8-Hinojosa
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1485
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 7-J. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 7-J. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1484
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 6-Nevárez
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1483
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 5-Anchia
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 4-Biedermann
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Point of order overruled Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 4-Biedermann
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1482
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 3-Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 2-Tinderholt
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 6(e)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 2-Tinderholt
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1481
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment tabled 1-S. Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Rodríguez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|