Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2200 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019