Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2212 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/24/2019

                            S.B. No. 2212


 AN ACT
 relating to the maintenance and operation of certain projects by
 certain drainage districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 34, Acts of the 57th Legislature, 3rd
 Called Session, 1962, is amended by adding Section 19 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 19.  (a)  The District may enter into a project
 partnership agreement with the United States Army Corps of
 Engineers or an agreement with the General Land Office or another
 state agency for a project proposed to be located in the District
 and listed in the Sabine Pass to Galveston Bay, Texas Coastal Storm
 Risk Management and Ecosystem Restoration report published by the
 United States Army Corps of Engineers in May 2017. If the District
 enters into a project partnership agreement or an agreement with
 the General Land Office or another state agency under this
 subsection, the District:
 (1)  must:
 (A)  develop a maintenance and operation plan for
 the proposed project; and
 (B)  biennially submit a report to the General
 Land Office and the legislature on:
 (i)  expenditures of state money relating to
 a project described by this subsection; and
 (ii)  the extent to which additional
 appropriations or additional money from any other source is needed
 for the next biennium; and
 (2)  may enter into an agreement for a public-private
 partnership to fund a local share of or the costs of the operation
 and maintenance of a project described by this subsection.
 (a-1)  If the District enters into a project partnership
 agreement or an agreement with the General Land Office or another
 state agency under this section before May 1, 2020, the initial
 report described by Subsection (a)(1)(B) of this section must be
 submitted not later than June 1, 2020. This subsection expires
 January 1, 2021.
 (b)  If a project described by Subsection (a) of this section
 is built in the District, the District may accept money from any
 source to:
 (1)  fund the maintenance and operation of the project;
 and
 (2)  provide local matching funds required by the
 project partnership agreement with the United States Army Corps of
 Engineers.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 307, Acts of the 58th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 1963, is amended by adding Section 20 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 20.  (a)  The District may enter into a project
 partnership agreement with the United States Army Corps of
 Engineers or an agreement with the General Land Office or another
 state agency for a project proposed to be located in the District
 and listed in the Sabine Pass to Galveston Bay, Texas Coastal Storm
 Risk Management and Ecosystem Restoration report published by the
 United States Army Corps of Engineers in May 2017. If the District
 enters into a project partnership agreement or an agreement with
 the General Land Office or another state agency under this
 subsection, the District:
 (1)  must:
 (A)  develop a maintenance and operation plan for
 the proposed project; and
 (B)  biennially submit a report to the General
 Land Office and the legislature on:
 (i)  expenditures of state money relating to
 a project described by this subsection; and
 (ii)  the extent to which additional
 appropriations or additional money from any other source is needed
 for the next biennium; and
 (2)   may enter into an agreement for a public-private
 partnership to fund a local share of or the costs of the operation
 and maintenance of a project described by this subsection.
 (a-1)  If the District enters into a project partnership
 agreement or an agreement with the General Land Office or another
 state agency under this section before May 1, 2020, the initial
 report described by Subsection (a)(1)(B) of this section must be
 submitted not later than June 1, 2020. This subsection expires
 January 1, 2021.
 (b)  If a project described by Subsection (a) of this section
 is built in the District, the District may accept money from any
 source to:
 (1)  fund the maintenance and operation of the project;
 and
 (2)  provide local matching funds required by the
 project partnership agreement with the United States Army Corps of
 Engineers.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 44, Acts of the 57th Legislature, 3rd
 Called Session, 1962, is amended by adding Section 14 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 14.  (a)  The District may enter into a project
 partnership agreement with the United States Army Corps of
 Engineers or an agreement with the General Land Office or another
 state agency for a project proposed to be located in the District
 and listed in the Sabine Pass to Galveston Bay, Texas Coastal Storm
 Risk Management and Ecosystem Restoration report published by the
 United States Army Corps of Engineers in May 2017. If the District
 enters into a project partnership agreement or an agreement with
 the General Land Office or another state agency under this
 subsection, the District:
 (1)  must:
 (A)  develop a maintenance and operation plan for
 the proposed project; and
 (B)  biennially submit a report to the General
 Land Office and the legislature on:
 (i)  expenditures of state money relating to
 a project described by this subsection; and
 (ii)  the extent to which additional
 appropriations or additional money from any other source is needed
 for the next biennium; and
 (2)  may enter into an agreement for a public-private
 partnership to fund a local share of or the costs of the operation
 and maintenance of a project described by this subsection.
 (a-1)  If the District enters into a project partnership
 agreement or an agreement with the General Land Office or another
 state agency under this section before May 1, 2020, the initial
 report described by Subsection (a)(1)(B) of this section must be
 submitted not later than June 1, 2020. This subsection expires
 January 1, 2021.
 (b)  If a project described by Subsection (a) of this section
 is built in the District, the District may accept money from any
 source to:
 (1)  fund the maintenance and operation of the project;
 and
 (2)  provide local matching funds required by the
 project partnership agreement with the United States Army Corps of
 Engineers.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2212 passed the Senate on
 April 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 24, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2212 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor