House | 05/21/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Referred to Higher Education | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/26/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2019 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |