Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | + | 86R13149 JG-F | |
1 | 2 | By: Buckingham S.B. No. 2236 | |
2 | - | (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read | |
3 | - | first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services; | |
4 | - | May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee | |
5 | - | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 9, 2019, | |
6 | - | sent to printer.) | |
7 | - | Click here to see the committee vote | |
8 | - | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2236 By: Buckingham | |
9 | 3 | ||
10 | 4 | ||
11 | 5 | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED | |
12 | 6 | AN ACT | |
13 | - | relating to the sunset review of the Texas Health Services | |
14 | - | Authority and the repeal of certain provisions affecting the | |
7 | + | relating to the repeal of certain provisions affecting the | |
15 | 8 | electronic exchange of health information. | |
16 | 9 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: | |
17 | - | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 182, Health and Safety | |
18 | - | Code, is amended by adding Section 182.004 to read as follows: | |
19 | - | Sec. 182.004. APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The Texas Health | |
20 | - | Services Authority is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code | |
21 | - | (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by | |
22 | - | that chapter, the corporation is abolished and this section, | |
23 | - | Section 182.001, and Subchapters B and C expire September 1, 2027. | |
24 | - | SECTION 2. The following provisions of the Health and | |
10 | + | SECTION 1. The following provisions of the Health and | |
25 | 11 | Safety Code are repealed: | |
26 | 12 | (1) Section 182.003; | |
27 | 13 | (2) Section 182.052; | |
28 | 14 | (3) Section 182.101(b); | |
29 | 15 | (4) Section 182.102(c); | |
30 | 16 | (5) Section 182.103(d); | |
31 | 17 | (6) Section 182.104(b); | |
32 | 18 | (7) Section 182.105(b); | |
33 | 19 | (8) Section 182.106(b); | |
34 | 20 | (9) Section 182.107(d); and | |
35 | 21 | (10) Section 182.108(f). | |
36 | - | SECTION | |
22 | + | SECTION 2. Section 15(b), Chapter 12 (S.B. 203), Acts of the | |
37 | 23 | 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, which added Sections | |
38 | 24 | 182.108(g), (h), (i), (j), (k), (l), (m), and (n), Health and Safety | |
39 | 25 | Code, effective September 1, 2021, is repealed. | |
40 | - | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. | |
41 | - | * * * * * | |
26 | + | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |