Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB225 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 10, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2019
Bill March 6, 2019