Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2250 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Johnson S.B. No. 2250
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
4- Relations; April 26, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5- Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 3;
6- April 26, 2019, sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2250 By: Menéndez
92
103
114 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
125 AN ACT
13- relating to low income housing tax credits administered by the
14- Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
6+ relating to financial assistance administered by the Texas
7+ Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
158 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
16- SECTION 1. Section 2306.256, Government Code, is amended by
17- amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
9+ SECTION 1. Section 2306.256(b), Government Code, is amended
10+ by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
1811 follows:
1912 (b) Through the program, the department shall:
2013 (1) maintain data on housing projected to lose its
2114 affordable status;
2215 (2) develop policies necessary to ensure the
2316 preservation of affordable housing in this state;
2417 (3) advise other program areas with respect to the
2518 policies; [and]
2619 (4) assist those other program areas in implementing
2720 the policies;
2821 (5) create for developments that have received an
2922 allocation of low income housing tax credits a comprehensive
3023 preservation strategy that includes:
31- (A) the identification of developments at risk of
32- withdrawing from the low income housing tax credit program in the
33- next two years and five years;
24+ (A) the identification of developments projected
25+ to lose their affordable status in the next two years and five
26+ years;
3427 (B) a system for prioritizing developments for
3528 preservation; and
3629 (C) policy and funding strategies for preserving
3730 developments prioritized under the system described by Paragraph
3831 (B); and
3932 (6) with respect to developments described by
40- Subdivision (5), adopt and implement an affirmative marketing
41- strategy for identifying and securing commitments from qualified
42- entities who will maintain affordable housing options in
33+ Subdivision (5), adopt and implement a proactive marketing strategy
34+ for identifying buyers who will maintain the affordability of
4335 developments when the owner of the development applies for a
4436 qualified contract or notifies the department under Section
4537 2306.6726 of the owner's intent to sell the development.
4638 (c) The department's marketing strategy under Subsection
4739 (b)(6) must include a process for:
48- (1) affirmatively developing and maintaining a list of
40+ (1) proactively developing and maintaining a list of
4941 qualified entities, as that term is defined in Section 2306.6726;
5042 and
5143 (2) contacting qualified entities, through a means
5244 other than e-mail or general postings on the department's website,
5345 to inform the entities of opportunities to purchase and preserve
5446 affordable housing.
5547 SECTION 2. Section 2306.6717(a), Government Code, is
5648 amended to read as follows:
5749 (a) Subject to Section 2306.67041, the department shall
5850 make the following items available on the department's website:
5951 (1) as soon as practicable, any proposed application
6052 submitted through the preapplication process established by this
6153 subchapter;
6254 (2) before the 30th day preceding the date of the
6355 relevant board allocation decision, except as provided by
6456 Subdivision (3), the entire application, including all supporting
6557 documents and exhibits, the application log, a scoring sheet
6658 providing details of the application score, and any other document
6759 relating to the processing of the application;
6860 (3) not later than the third working day after the date
6961 of the relevant determination, the results of each stage of the
7062 application process, including the results of the application
7163 scoring and underwriting phases and the allocation phase;
7264 (4) before the 15th day preceding the date of board
7365 action on the amendment, notice of an amendment under Section
7466 2306.6712 and the recommendation of the director and monitor
7567 regarding the amendment; [and]
7668 (5) an appeal filed with the department or board under
7769 Section 2306.0504 or 2306.6715 and any other document relating to
7870 the processing of the appeal; and
7971 (6) the land use restriction agreement, including any
80- amendments to the agreement, for each housing tax credit property
81- subject to such an agreement.
82- SECTION 3. Not later than January 15, 2020, the Texas
83- Department of Housing and Community Affairs shall adopt rules as
84- necessary to implement the changes in law made by this Act.
85- SECTION 4. The Texas Department of Housing and Community
86- Affairs is required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
87- legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
88- the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
89- purpose, the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs may,
90- but is not required to, implement a provision of this Act using
91- other appropriations available for that purpose.
92- SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
93- * * * * *
72+ amendments to the agreement, for each low income housing tax credit
73+ property subject to such an agreement.
74+ SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.