Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB228 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2019
Bill March 6, 2019