Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB230 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2019
Bill March 6, 2019