Senate | 05/17/2019 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Referred to Higher Education | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |