Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2304 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Taylor S.B. No. 2304
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
4+ April 24, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6,
5+ Nays 2; April 24, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
49 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
510 AN ACT
611 relating to eligibility to establish a multiple employer welfare
712 arrangement.
813 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
914 SECTION 1. Section 846.053, Insurance Code, is amended by
1015 amending Subsections (b) and (c) and adding Subsections (c-1) and
1116 (d-1) to read as follows:
1217 (b) The employers in the multiple employer welfare
1318 arrangement must:
1419 (1) be members of an association or group of five or
1520 more businesses that are in the same trade or industry, including
1621 closely related businesses that provide support, services, or
1722 supplies primarily to that trade or industry; or
1823 (2) each have a principal place of business in the same
1924 region that does not exceed the boundaries of this state or the
2025 boundaries of a metropolitan statistical area designated by the
2126 United States Office of Management and Budget.
2227 (c) If the employers in the multiple employer welfare
2328 arrangement are members of an association, the association must[:
2429 [(1)] be engaged in substantial activity for its
2530 members other than sponsorship of an employee welfare benefit
2631 plan[; and
2732 [(2) have been in existence for at least two years
2833 before engaging in any activities relating to providing employee
2934 health benefits to its members].
3035 (c-1) To determine whether a multiple employer welfare
3136 arrangement is considered a large employer, participating
3237 employees are counted in the aggregate at the level of the multiple
3338 employer welfare arrangement.
3439 (d-1) A working owner of a trade or business without
3540 employees may qualify both as an employer and as an employee of the
3641 trade or industry for the purposes of this section.
3742 SECTION 2. Section 846.053, Insurance Code, as amended by
3843 this Act, applies only to an application for a certificate of
3944 authority as a multiple employer welfare arrangement submitted on
4045 or after January 1, 2020. An application submitted before January
4146 1, 2020, is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the
4247 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
4348 that purpose.
4449 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
50+ * * * * *