Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2309 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/23/2019

                            S.B. No. 2309


 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of jurisdiction over and management of the
 Star of the Republic Museum to the Texas Historical Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 442, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter B-1 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER B-1. STAR OF THE REPUBLIC MUSEUM
 Sec. 442.061.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "museum"
 means the Star of the Republic Museum.
 Sec. 442.062.  JURISDICTION AND MAINTENANCE OF MUSEUM.
 (a)  The museum and its contents are under the jurisdiction of the
 commission. The commission is responsible for the preservation,
 maintenance, and operation of the museum.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), Blinn College District
 maintains ownership of the museum, the land on which the museum is
 located, and the artifacts in the museum.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), any power or duty
 related to the museum formerly vested in any other state agency or
 entity is vested solely in the commission.
 (d)  The commission shall, in coordination with an advisory
 committee appointed by the board of trustees of the Blinn College
 District, promote the educational and public awareness programs at
 the museum, the Washington-on-the-Brazos State Historic Site, and
 the Barrington Living History Farm.
 Sec. 442.063.  GRANTS; DONATIONS. The commission may accept
 a grant or donation for any program or purpose of the museum.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  On January 1, 2020, the following are
 transferred to the Texas Historical Commission:
 (1)  all powers and duties of Blinn College District
 relating to the Star of the Republic Museum;
 (2)  all unobligated and unexpended funds
 appropriated, donated, or contributed to Blinn College District
 designated for the administration of any part of the Star of the
 Republic Museum; and
 (3)  all files and other records of Blinn College
 District kept by Blinn College District regarding the Star of the
 Republic Museum.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, Blinn College District
 shall continue to perform functions and activities related to the
 Star of the Republic Museum until January 1, 2020, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2309 passed the Senate on
 April 17, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2309 passed the House on
 May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor