| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read |
---|
| 3 | + | first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 10, 2019, |
---|
| 4 | + | reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; |
---|
| 5 | + | May 10, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
2 | 7 | | |
---|
3 | 8 | | |
---|
4 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 11 | | relating to providing for the review of certain county departments |
---|
7 | 12 | | of education by the Sunset Advisory Commission. |
---|
8 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 14 | | SECTION 1. (a) The county department of education in a |
---|
10 | 15 | | county with a population of 3.3 million or more according to the |
---|
11 | 16 | | most recent federal decennial census is subject to review under |
---|
12 | 17 | | Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act), as if the |
---|
13 | 18 | | department were a state agency, but the department may not be |
---|
14 | 19 | | abolished under that chapter. The review shall be conducted as if |
---|
15 | 20 | | the department were scheduled to be abolished September 1, 2021. |
---|
16 | 21 | | (b) The review must assess the department's governance, |
---|
17 | 22 | | management, and operating structure, and the department's |
---|
18 | 23 | | compliance with legislative requirements. |
---|
19 | 24 | | (c) The department shall pay the cost incurred by the Sunset |
---|
20 | 25 | | Advisory Commission in performing a review of the department under |
---|
21 | 26 | | this section. The Sunset Advisory Commission shall determine the |
---|
22 | 27 | | cost, and the department shall pay the amount promptly on receipt of |
---|
23 | 28 | | a statement from the Sunset Advisory Commission detailing the cost. |
---|
24 | 29 | | (d) This Act expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
25 | 30 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|