Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2345 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/30/2019

                            By: Creighton S.B. No. 2345
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Property Tax;
 April 30, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 30, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2345 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of real property
 leased to and used by certain schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 11, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 11.211 to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.211.  REAL PROPERTY LEASED TO CERTAIN SCHOOLS.
 (a)  A person is entitled to an exemption from taxation of the
 portion of the real property that the person owns and leases to an
 open-enrollment charter school authorized by Subchapter D, Chapter
 12, Education Code, that is qualified as provided by Section
 11.21(d) of this code if:
 (1)  the portion of the real property that is leased to
 the school is:
 (A)  used exclusively by the school for the
 operation or administration of the school or the performance of
 other educational functions by the school; and
 (B)  reasonably necessary for a purpose described
 by Paragraph (A); and
 (2)  the owner of the portion of the real property that
 is leased to the school certifies by affidavit to the school that:
 (A)  if the lease agreement requires the school to
 pay the taxes imposed on the real property as a portion of the total
 consideration paid to the property owner under the agreement, the
 owner will reduce the total consideration required to be paid by the
 school under the lease agreement by an amount equal to the amount by
 which the taxes on the real property are reduced as a result of the
 exemption by providing a monthly or annual credit against the total
 consideration due under the agreement; or
 (B)  if the lease agreement requires the school to
 pay the taxes imposed on the real property directly to the collector
 for the applicable taxing unit or to the owner or the property
 manager separately from the payment of rent to the property owner
 under the agreement, the school is no longer required to pay the
 taxes to the collector, owner, or property manager, as applicable,
 and the rent charged to the school under the agreement is not
 affected unless a term of the agreement specifically provides for a
 change in the amount of the rent.
 (b)  A property owner required to provide an affidavit
 described by Subsection (a)(2)(A) to an open-enrollment charter
 school shall:
 (1)  provide the school with a disclosure document
 stating the amount by which the taxes on the real property are
 reduced as a result of the exemption and the method the owner will
 implement to ensure that the total consideration for the lease of
 the real property fully reflects the total amount of that
 reduction; and
 (2)  reduce the total consideration for the lease of
 the real property through a monthly or annual credit against the
 total consideration to reflect the amount by which the taxes on the
 real property are reduced as a result of the exemption.
 (c)  This section may not be construed as invalidating an
 exemption from taxation of real property granted to an
 open-enrollment charter school on the basis of Section 12.128,
 Education Code, before January 1, 2020.
 (d)  Section 25.07 does not apply to a leasehold interest in
 real property for which the owner receives an exemption under this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to ad valorem taxes imposed
 for a tax year beginning on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2020, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 86th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2019, authorizing the legislature to exempt from
 ad valorem taxation real property leased to certain schools
 organized and operated primarily for the purpose of engaging in
 educational functions is approved by the voters.  If that amendment
 is not approved by the voters, this Act has no effect.
 * * * * *