Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB235 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/21/2019

                    S.B. No. 235


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain municipalities to propose a
 fire control, prevention, and emergency medical services district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 344.051, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (a-3) to read as follows:
 (a-3)  The governing body of a municipality may propose the
 creation of a fire control, prevention, and emergency medical
 services district under this chapter if the municipality:
 (1)  has a population of 19,000 or more and less than
 60,000; and
 (2)  contains a branch campus of North Central Texas
 College.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 235 passed the Senate on
 April 4, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 21, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 235 passed the House, with
 amendment, on April 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 148,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor