Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB235 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2019
Bill March 6, 2019