Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2388 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/08/2019

                            86R6585 LED-D
 By: Powell S.B. No. 2388


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to services provided to and collection of data regarding
 individuals with acquired brain injury.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0982 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0982.  SERVICES FOR INDIVIDUALS WITH ACQUIRED BRAIN
 INJURY. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Council" means the Texas Brain Injury Advisory
 Council established under 1 T.A.C. Section 351.825.
 (2)  "Office" means the office of acquired brain injury
 within the commission.
 (b)  The commission, in collaboration with the council and
 the office, shall periodically review and evaluate:
 (1)  acquired brain injury programs in other states to
 develop best practices for this state; and
 (2)  services provided to individuals who have
 experienced a concussion, particularly services provided to
 students in public education systems, for consistency and efficacy.
 (c)  The commission, in collaboration with the council, the
 office, and the Department of Public Safety, shall develop an
 identification card for individuals with acquired brain injury to
 help those individuals when interacting with law enforcement and
 emergency medical services personnel.  The commission shall
 collaborate with the Department of Public Safety to ensure that law
 enforcement and emergency medical services personnel throughout
 the state recognize the identification card and understand the
 impact an acquired brain injury may have on an individual's
 behavior.
 SECTION 2.  Section 92.002(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Spinal cord injuries, acquired brain injuries,
 including traumatic and non-traumatic brain injuries, and
 submersion injuries are reportable to the department. The
 executive commissioner by rule shall define those terms for
 reporting purposes.
 SECTION 3.  Section 92.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The executive commissioner by rule shall develop
 reporting requirements to ensure acquired brain injury data is
 reported in each case in which an acquired brain injury has
 occurred, without regard to whether acquired brain injury is the
 primary diagnosis.
 SECTION 4.  Section 32.024, Human Resources Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (oo) to read as follows:
 (oo) The commission shall provide medical assistance for
 cognitive rehabilitation therapy for a recipient of medical
 assistance who suffers an acquired brain injury, regardless of when
 the injury occurred.
 SECTION 5.  Section 1352.001, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (d)  This chapter applies to stop-loss insurance that, due to
 the low level at which the insurer's liability attaches, serves the
 same function as conventional group accident and health insurance
 policies, as determined in accordance with rules adopted by the
 commissioner.  This chapter does not apply to employers or
 self-funded health benefit plans.
 (e)  In this section, "stop-loss insurance" means a policy of
 insurance that indemnifies, directly or indirectly, a self-funded
 health benefit plan for a portion of the plan's liability for
 benefits for plan participants. The term includes excess loss
 insurance and other equivalent coverage, aggregate stop-loss
 insurance, and individual stop-loss insurance.
 SECTION 6.  Subchapter C, Chapter 352, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 352.109 to read as follows:
 Sec. 352.109.  VOCATIONAL REHABILITATION SERVICES FOR
 INDIVIDUALS WITH ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURY. (a) In this section,
 "council" and "office" have the meanings assigned by Section
 531.0982, Government Code.
 (b)  The commission, in collaboration with the council and
 the office, shall implement a program to provide vocational
 rehabilitation services to individuals with acquired brain injury
 across all levels of functioning, including by providing ongoing
 support as needed to maintain the individual's employment.
 SECTION 7.  (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
 Commission.
 (2)  "Council" has the meaning assigned by Section
 531.0982, Government Code.
 (3)  "Office" has the meaning assigned by Section
 531.0982, Government Code.
 (b)  The commission, in collaboration with the office and the
 council, shall develop a comprehensive plan to improve long-term
 outcomes, reduce disabilities, and decrease long-term health care
 costs for individuals with acquired brain injury.
 (c)  The comprehensive plan must:
 (1)  regarding long-term residential services and
 community services including day habilitation, supported living,
 and supported work:
 (A)  assess services currently available; and
 (B)  identify gaps in and barriers to accessing
 those services;
 (2)  identify actions necessary to ensure that health
 care providers have the knowledge and skills to meet the needs of
 individuals with acquired brain injury;
 (3)  develop tools, protocols, and reporting
 procedures for use by hospitals, emergency systems, school
 districts, state agencies, and others to identify individuals with
 acquired brain injury; and
 (4)  develop a uniform screening and assessment tool to
 identify the services and supports needed by an individual with an
 acquired brain injury.
 (d)  Not later than November 30, 2020, the commission shall
 prepare and submit to the legislature a report describing the
 comprehensive plan required by this section.
 SECTION 8.  (a)  Not later than December 31, 2019, the
 commissioner of insurance shall adopt rules necessary to implement
 Section 1352.001(d), Insurance Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  The change in law made by this Act applies only to an
 insurance policy that is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed
 on or after January 1, 2020. A policy delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2020, is governed by the law
 as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 9.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.