Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB241 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019