Senate | 05/03/2019 | Recommendations filed with the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/16/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |