Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2469 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 26, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2019
Bill April 15, 2019