Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2480 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 2480
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 26, 2019; March 27, 2019, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
4+ April 11, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 11, 2019,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2480 By: Campbell
29
310
411 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
512 AN ACT
613 relating to the establishment of the Medicaid Waiver Legislative
714 Oversight Committee.
815 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
916 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
1017 amended by adding Section 531.172 to read as follows:
1118 Sec. 531.172. MEDICAID WAIVER LEGISLATIVE OVERSIGHT
1219 COMMITTEE. (a) In this section:
1320 (1) "Committee" means the Medicaid Waiver Legislative
1421 Oversight Committee established under this section.
1522 (2) "Section 1115 waiver" means the Texas Healthcare
1623 Transformation and Quality Improvement Program waiver under
1724 Section 1115 of the federal Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section
1825 1315).
1926 (b) The Medicaid Waiver Legislative Oversight Committee is
2027 created to oversee and advise the commission regarding the Section
2128 1115 waiver and the commission's negotiations with the Centers for
2229 Medicare and Medicaid Services or other appropriate federal agency
2330 to renew the waiver, including the extension or renewal of the
2431 uncompensated care pool and the transition plan for the delivery
2532 system that will succeed the Delivery System Reform Incentive
2633 Payment (DSRIP) program.
2734 (c) The committee is composed of eight members, as follows:
2835 (1) four members of the senate, appointed by the
2936 lieutenant governor; and
3037 (2) four members of the house of representatives,
3138 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives.
3239 (d) A member of the committee serves at the pleasure of the
3340 appointing official.
3441 (e) The lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of
3542 representatives shall each designate a co-chair from among the
3643 committee members.
3744 (f) A member of the committee may not receive compensation
3845 for serving on the committee but is entitled to reimbursement for
3946 travel expenses incurred by the member while conducting the
4047 business of the committee as provided by the General Appropriations
4148 Act.
4249 (g) The committee shall:
4350 (1) oversee the Section 1115 waiver and facilitate the
4451 design and development of the renewed waiver;
4552 (2) meet at the call of the co-chairs; and
4653 (3) research, take public testimony, and issue reports
4754 requested by the lieutenant governor or speaker of the house of
4855 representatives.
4956 (h) The committee may request reports and other information
5057 from the commission.
5158 (i) The committee shall use existing staff of the senate,
5259 the house of representatives, and the Texas Legislative Council to
5360 assist the committee in performing its duties under this section.
5461 (j) On September 1, 2023, the committee is abolished and
5562 this section expires.
5663 SECTION 2. Not later than October 1, 2019, the lieutenant
5764 governor and the speaker of the house of representatives shall
5865 appoint the members of the Medicaid Waiver Legislative Oversight
5966 Committee as required by Section 531.172(c), Government Code, as
6067 added by this Act.
6168 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
6269 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
6370 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
6471 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
6572 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
73+ * * * * *