Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2502 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 1, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2019
Bill April 15, 2019