Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2504 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 1, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2019
Bill April 23, 2019