Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB254 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/03/2019

                    By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 254
 (In the Senate - Filed December 19, 2018; February 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 3, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 April 3, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 254 By:  Alvarado


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to court appointment of a receiver for a property that is
 in violation of certain ordinances in certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 214.003, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsections (b-1) and
 [Subsection] (c), the court may appoint as a receiver for the
 property a nonprofit organization or an individual with a
 demonstrated record of rehabilitating properties if the court finds
 that:
 (1)  the structures on the property are in violation of
 the standards set forth in Section 214.001(b) and an ordinance
 described by Subsection (a);
 (2)  notice of violation was given to the record owner
 of the property; and
 (3)  a public hearing as required by Section 214.001(b)
 has been conducted.
 (b-1)  This section applies only to a municipality located
 along the international border with Mexico and with a population of
 800,000 or more.  The court may appoint as a receiver under
 Subsection (b) an individual without a demonstrated record of
 rehabilitating properties if the municipality demonstrates that:
 (1)  no individual with a demonstrated record of
 rehabilitating properties is available; and
 (2)  the individual being appointed is competent and
 able to fulfill the duties of a receiver.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *