Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB254 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 20, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 8, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019